NJ S477 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S280

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-4)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.120.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Extends statute of limitations in civil actions for sexual abuse claims; expands categories of potential defendants in civil actions; creates two-year window for parties to bring previously time-barred actions based on sexual abuse.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends statute of limitations in civil actions for sexual abuse claims; expands categories of potential defendants in civil actions; creates two-year window for parties to bring previously time-barred actions based on sexual abuse.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3648 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.120.
2019-03-25AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-0-5)
2019-03-25AssemblySubstituted for A3648 (ACS)
2019-03-18AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-03-14SenatePassed by the Senate (32-1)
2019-03-07SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

S280 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A3648 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S477 (SCS)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback