NJ S464 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1066
Note: Carry Over of previous S4200
Note: Carry Over of previous S851
Note: Carry Over of previous A1637
Note: Carry Over of previous S4200
Note: Carry Over of previous S851
Note: Carry Over of previous A1637
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises conditions for use of virtual or remote instruction to meet minimum 180-day school year requirement.
Title
Revises conditions for use of virtual or remote instruction to meet minimum 180-day school year requirement.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Sacco [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Samuel Thompson [R] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (39-0) (Sacco) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Sacco) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S464 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S4200 (Carry Over) 2021-12-02 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A2199 (Same As) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S851 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1637 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S4200 (Carry Over) 2021-12-02 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A2199 (Same As) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S851 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1637 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee