NJ S451 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.219.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.219.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Office of the Special Education Ombudsman in DOE.
Title
Establishes Office of the Special Education Ombudsman in DOE.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1103 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.219. |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-2-0) |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted for A1103 |
2015-12-10 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2015-11-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1103 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S451
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/S451 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/S0500/451_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S451 |