NJ S4341 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1901
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4517 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4517 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "New Jersey Eviction Crisis Task Force."
Title
Establishes "New Jersey Eviction Crisis Task Force."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A4517 (1R) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4341 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4517 (1R)
A4517 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.484.
A4517 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.484.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S4341 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S4500/4341_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S4500/4341_R1.HTM |