NJ S434 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2101
Note: Carry Foward to future S215
Note: Carry Over of previous S4227
Note: Carry Over of previous A6247
Note: Carry Foward to future S215
Note: Carry Over of previous S4227
Note: Carry Over of previous A6247
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts to include environmental sustainability plan in long-range facilities plan.
Title
Requires school districts to include environmental sustainability plan in long-range facilities plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Sen. Nia Gill [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (26-10) |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S434 (Carry Over) 2022-06-16 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S434 (Carry Over) 2022-06-16 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S4227 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A6247 (Carry Over) 2022-01-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A4546 (Same As) 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S434 (Carry Over) 2022-06-16 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S4227 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A6247 (Carry Over) 2022-01-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A4546 (Same As) 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee