NJ A4546 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2101
Note: Carry Foward to future S215
Note: Carry Over of previous A6247
Note: Carry Over of previous S4227
Note: Carry Foward to future S215
Note: Carry Over of previous A6247
Note: Carry Over of previous S4227
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts to include environmental sustainability plan in long-range facilities plan.
Title
Requires school districts to include environmental sustainability plan in long-range facilities plan.
Sponsors
Rep. James Kennedy [D] | Rep. Shama Haider [D] | Rep. Sterley Stanley [D] | Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] |
Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4546 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A4546 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S434 (Same As) 2022-06-16 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A6247 (Carry Over) 2022-01-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S4227 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A4546 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S434 (Same As) 2022-06-16 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A6247 (Carry Over) 2022-01-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S4227 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A4546 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A5000/4546_I1.HTM |