NJ S432 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S651
Note: Carry Foward to future A161
Note: Carry Over of previous S1597
Note: Carry Over of previous A4058
Note: Carry Foward to future A161
Note: Carry Over of previous S1597
Note: Carry Over of previous A4058
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises workers' compensation coverage for certain injuries to volunteer and professional public safety and law enforcement personnel.
Title
Revises workers' compensation coverage for certain injuries to volunteer and professional public safety and law enforcement personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
S432 (Carry Over) 2020-03-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S432 (Carry Over) 2020-03-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S1597 (Carry Over) 2018-05-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3933 (Same As) 2020-04-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A4058 (Carry Over) 2018-06-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S432 (Carry Over) 2020-03-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S1597 (Carry Over) 2018-05-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3933 (Same As) 2020-04-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A4058 (Carry Over) 2018-06-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S432 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S0500/432_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S432 |