NJ S4282 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5977 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5977 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for establishment of Regional Health Hub Program as replacement to Accountable Care Organization Demonstration Project, and designates existing accountable care organizations and look-alike organizations as Regional Health Hubs.
Title
Provides for establishment of Regional Health Hub Program as replacement to Accountable Care Organization Demonstration Project, and designates existing accountable care organizations and look-alike organizations as Regional Health Hubs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A5977 (2R) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5977 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.517.