NJ S4228 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A861
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.367.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.367.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns tax data sharing between State Treasury and DOLWD.
Title
Concerns tax data sharing between State Treasury and DOLWD.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] |
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5842 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-20 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.367. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-3-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A5842 (1R) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4228 (Carry Over) 2020-01-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.367.
A5842 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4228 (1R)
A5842 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4228 (1R)