NJ S4227 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5843
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5843
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employers to post notice for employees on employee misclassification.
Title
Requires employers to post notice for employees on employee misclassification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A5843 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5843 (Same As) 2020-01-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.375.