NJ S412 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2031
Note: Carry Over of previous S1740
Note: Carry Over of previous A1311
Note: Carry Over of previous S1740
Note: Carry Over of previous A1311
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Historic Property Reinvestment Act"; provides credits against certain taxes for certain costs of rehabilitating historic properties.
Title
"Historic Property Reinvestment Act"; provides credits against certain taxes for certain costs of rehabilitating historic properties.
Sponsors
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Sen. Chris Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2031 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3561 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
S1740 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Combined with S2031 (SCS)
A1311 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
A3561 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
S1740 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Combined with S2031 (SCS)
A1311 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S412 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S0500/412_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S412 |