NJ A3561 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1311
Note: Carry Over of previous S2031
Note: Carry Over of previous S1740
Note: Carry Over of previous S2031
Note: Carry Over of previous S1740
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Historic Property Reinvestment Act"; provides credits against certain taxes for certain costs of rehabilitating historic properties.
Title
"Historic Property Reinvestment Act"; provides credits against certain taxes for certain costs of rehabilitating historic properties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S412 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1311 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S2031 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1740 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Combined with S2031 (SCS)
A1311 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S2031 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1740 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Combined with S2031 (SCS)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3561 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A4000/3561_I1.HTM |