NJ S4103 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on September 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A5802 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes FY 2020 supplemental appropriation of $9.5 million to DOH for family planning services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes FY 2020 supplemental appropriation of $9.5 million to DOH for family planning services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-16SenateSubstituted by A5802 (1R)
2019-12-05SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-09-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5802 (Same As) 2020-01-02 - Approved P.L.2019, c.277.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback