NJ S4102 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.421.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.421.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Direct Support Professional Career Development Program; appropriates $1,000,000.
Title
Establishes Direct Support Professional Career Development Program; appropriates $1,000,000.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A6230 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A6230 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.421. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted for A6230 (1R) |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2021-11-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6230 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S4102 (SCS/1R)