NJ S4078 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A183
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.316.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.316.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies lists of projects eligible to receive loans for environmental infrastructure projects from NJ Infrastructure Bank for FY2022.
Title
Modifies lists of projects eligible to receive loans for environmental infrastructure projects from NJ Infrastructure Bank for FY2022.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Kristin Corrado [R] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5974 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5974 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.316. |
2021-12-02 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2021-12-02 | Assembly | Substituted for A5974 |
2021-12-02 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2021-11-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4078 (Carry Over) 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.316.
A5974 (Same As) 2021-12-02 - Substituted by S4078
A5974 (Same As) 2021-12-02 - Substituted by S4078