NJ S4066 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S848
Note: Carry Foward to future A2140
Note: Carry Foward to future A2140
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises requirements for health care service firms to report financial information to Division of Consumer Affairs.
Title
Revises requirements for health care service firms to report financial information to Division of Consumer Affairs.
Sponsors
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4066 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S4066 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A6020 (Same As) 2019-12-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S4066 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A6020 (Same As) 2019-12-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee