NJ S4033 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1538
Note: Carry Over of previous A589
Note: Carry Over of previous S1638
Note: Carry Over of previous A589
Note: Carry Over of previous S1638
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Fair Repair Act"; concerns repairs to certain consumer electronics.
Title
"Fair Repair Act"; concerns repairs to certain consumer electronics.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4033 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1482 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A589 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S1638 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1482 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A589 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S1638 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S4033 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S4500/4033_I1.HTM |