NJ S3981 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5630 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5630 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Civil Service Commission to establish and maintain hotline for State employees to submit reports of workplace discrimination and harassment.
Title
Requires Civil Service Commission to establish and maintain hotline for State employees to submit reports of workplace discrimination and harassment.
Sponsors
Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Kristin Corrado [R] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A5630 (2R) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment (31-0) (Weinberg) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5630 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.508.