NJ S3977 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5524
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A1293 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A1293 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes advisory council for the brewery, cidery, meadery, and distillery industries in NJ and provides for funding through certain alcoholic beverage tax receipts.
Title
Establishes advisory council for the brewery, cidery, meadery, and distillery industries in NJ and provides for funding through certain alcoholic beverage tax receipts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted by A1293 (2R) |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment (25-0) (Greenstein) |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-11-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1293 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.438.
A5524 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
A5524 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee