NJ S396 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3649
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.379.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.379.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adjusts statute of limitations on damage claim for construction defect in common interest community.
Title
Adjusts statute of limitations on damage claim for construction defect in common interest community.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 22 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4903 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 22 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4903 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.379. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (47-22-0) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A4903 (1R) |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (30-2) |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3649 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A4903 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S396 (1R)
A4903 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S396 (1R)