NJ S3896 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5389 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5389 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires training or experience in crime victims' rights for certain members of Victims of Crime Compensation Review Board.
Title
Requires training or experience in crime victims' rights for certain members of Victims of Crime Compensation Review Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-09 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A5389 (1R) |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5389 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.502.