NJ S3890 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-21 - Substituted by A5417 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-21 - Substituted by A5417 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits limiting number of county college credits that may be applied towards educator preparation program and teacher certification requirements.
Title
Prohibits limiting number of county college credits that may be applied towards educator preparation program and teacher certification requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Renee Burgess [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-12 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-21 | Senate | Substituted by A5417 (1R) |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz) |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5417 (Same As) 2024-01-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.251.