NJ S3869 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.434.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.434.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits local governments from imposing fines on alarm companies in certain circumstances.
Title
Prohibits local governments from imposing fines on alarm companies in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5561 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.434. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-1) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A5561 |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5561 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3869