NJ S382 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A877
Note: Carry Over of previous S318
Note: Carry Over of previous A845
Note: Carry Over of previous S649
Note: Carry Over of previous A5304
Note: Carry Over of previous S318
Note: Carry Over of previous A845
Note: Carry Over of previous S649
Note: Carry Over of previous A5304
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires entities at every level of government to conduct periodic studies of racial and ethnic disparities in public contracting.
Title
Requires entities at every level of government to conduct periodic studies of racial and ethnic disparities in public contracting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S382 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S318 (Carry Over) 2021-01-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A845 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2761 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S649 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A5304 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S318 (Carry Over) 2021-01-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A845 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2761 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S649 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A5304 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S382 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S0500/382_I1.HTM |