NJ S3761 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4488
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A5306 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A5306 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain voters residing overseas to vote in certain elections in this State depending on overseas residency or intent to return.
Title
Allows certain voters residing overseas to vote in certain elections in this State depending on overseas residency or intent to return.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Senate | Substituted by A5306 (2R) |
2021-11-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5306 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
A4488 (Carry Over) 2018-09-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4488 (Carry Over) 2018-09-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee