NJ S3739 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A5392 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A5392 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes new liability standards in sexual abuse lawsuits filed against public entities and public employees.
Title
Establishes new liability standards in sexual abuse lawsuits filed against public entities and public employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Substituted by A5392 (1R) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5392 (Same As) 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.239.