NJ S3729 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Substituted by A5225 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Substituted by A5225 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for coverage of community-based palliative care benefits under Medicaid.
Title
Provides for coverage of community-based palliative care benefits under Medicaid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | Substituted by A5225 (2R) |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5225 (Same As) 2023-12-21 - Approved P.L.2023, c.187.