NJ S3708 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2810
Note: Carry Foward to future S1058
Note: Carry Foward to future S1058
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A5285 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A5285 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires copies of certain law enforcement records to be provided to victims of domestic violence upon request.
Title
Requires copies of certain law enforcement records to be provided to victims of domestic violence upon request.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-12-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | Substituted by A5285 (2R) |
2023-12-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3708 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A5285 (2R)
S3708 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A5285 (2R)
A5285 (Same As) 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.322.
S3708 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A5285 (2R)
A5285 (Same As) 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.322.