NJ S3691 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Passed on August 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-04 - Approved P.L.2021, c.188.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides financial relief to certain landlords and tenants in response to COVID-19 pandemic, adjusts certain court fees; and makes appropriations. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides financial relief to certain landlords and tenants in response to COVID-19 pandemic, adjusts certain court fees; and makes appropriations. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5685 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-04AssemblyApproved P.L.2021, c.188.
2021-06-24AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0)
2021-06-24AssemblySubstituted for A5685 (2R)
2021-06-24AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2021-06-24SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2021-06-21SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2021-04-26SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5685 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S3691 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback