NJ S366 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2395

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Pending: Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes manufacturing business assistance program to encourage manufacturing in certain areas of the State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes manufacturing business assistance program to encourage manufacturing in certain areas of the State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
2018-12-17SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-10-22SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-02-22SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2395 (Carry Over) 2016-10-20 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback