NJ S2395 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S366
Note: Carry Foward to future A5146
Note: Carry Foward to future A5146
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-20 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-20 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes manufacturing business assistance program to encourage manufacturing in certain areas of the State.
Title
Establishes manufacturing business assistance program to encourage manufacturing in certain areas of the State.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Rice [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-10-17 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2395 (Carry Over) 2016-10-20 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2395 (Carry Over) 2016-10-20 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5103 (Same As) 2017-07-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S2395 (Carry Over) 2016-10-20 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5103 (Same As) 2017-07-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee