NJ S3658 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Eliminates mandatory minimum terms of imprisonment determined by Legislature to be of non-violent nature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminates mandatory minimum terms of imprisonment determined by Legislature to be of non-violent nature.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 25 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 47 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5641 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-28SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2021-06-24AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (46-25-3)
2021-06-24AssemblyMotion To Table (Greenwald) (47-27-1)
2021-06-24AssemblyMotion To Aa (DePhillips)
2021-06-24AssemblySubstituted for A5641
2021-06-21AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-06-21AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Budget Committee
2021-06-09AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
2021-06-03SenatePassed by the Senate (23-14)
2021-04-19SenateIntroduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading

Same As/Similar To

S3456 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A5641 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S3658

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback