NJ A5641 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S3658
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S3658
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates mandatory minimum terms of imprisonment determined by Legislature to be of non-violent nature.
Title
Eliminates mandatory minimum terms of imprisonment determined by Legislature to be of non-violent nature.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Linda Carter [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] |
Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Pedro Mejia [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted by S3658 |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3658 (Same As) 2021-06-28 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate