NJ S3577 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A303
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A492 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A492 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Protects employee rights to ownership and usage of employee inventions developed entirely on employee's own time and without using employer's resources.
Title
Protects employee rights to ownership and usage of employee inventions developed entirely on employee's own time and without using employer's resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Senate | Substituted by A492 (2R) |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Turner) |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
A492 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0)
A303 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A303 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee