NJ S3502 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2277(2R)
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-1-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-1-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Governor to withdraw from compact establishing Waterfront Commission of New York Harbor; dissolves compact and commission; transfers commission's NJ operations to State Police.
Title
Directs Governor to withdraw from compact establishing Waterfront Commission of New York Harbor; dissolves compact and commission; transfers commission's NJ operations to State Police.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2179 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-1-1) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A2179 |
2017-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2042 (Same As) 2016-04-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S2277(2R) (Carry Over) 2015-05-07 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
S2277(2R) (Carry Over) 2015-05-07 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate