NJ S2277 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2042
Note: Carry Foward to future S3502
Note: Carry Foward to future S3502
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-10)
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Governor to withdraw from compact establishing Waterfront Commission of New York Harbor; dissolves compact and commission; transfers commission's NJ operations to State Police.
Title
Directs Governor to withdraw from compact establishing Waterfront Commission of New York Harbor; dissolves compact and commission; transfers commission's NJ operations to State Police.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3506 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3506 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3506 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Substituted for A3506 (1R) |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2014-10-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2277 (Carry Over) 2015-05-07 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
S2277(2R) (Carry Over) 2015-05-07 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A3506 (Same As) 2015-03-09 - Substituted by S2277 (2R)
S2277(2R) (Carry Over) 2015-05-07 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A3506 (Same As) 2015-03-09 - Substituted by S2277 (2R)