NJ S3496 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5072 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5072 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Defense Against Porch Pirates Act"; creates new category of theft, with penalties including mandatory restitution and community service, for taking package delivered to residence by cargo carrier.*
Title
"Defense Against Porch Pirates Act"; creates new category of theft, with penalties including mandatory restitution and community service, for taking package delivered to residence by cargo carrier.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A5072 (1R) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5072 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session