NJ S349 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S4106

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-14 - Approved P.L.2020, c.80.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires developers to offer electric vehicle charging stations as option in certain new home construction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires developers to offer electric vehicle charging stations as option in certain new home construction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1993 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-14AssemblyApproved P.L.2020, c.80.
2020-07-30AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-2-0)
2020-07-30AssemblySubstituted for A1993 (1R)
2020-07-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-07-02AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
2020-06-29SenatePassed by the Senate (36-2)
2020-06-04SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

S4106 (Carry Over) 2019-09-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A1993 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Substituted by S349 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback