NJ S3487 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1208
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A4814 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A4814 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits investment of pension and annuity funds by State in entities that avoid Superfund obligations to State.
Title
Prohibits investment of pension and annuity funds by State in entities that avoid Superfund obligations to State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Substituted by A4814 (1R) |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3487 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A4814 (1R)
A4814 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)
A4814 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)