NJ A4814 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A997
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits investment of pension and annuity funds by State in entities that avoid Superfund obligations to State.
Title
Prohibits investment of pension and annuity funds by State in entities that avoid Superfund obligations to State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3487 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Substituted for S3487 (1R) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (69-0-0) |
2017-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4814 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)
S3487 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A4814 (1R)
S3487 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A4814 (1R)