NJ S347 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S4003

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.117.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes "NJ One Health Task Force."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes "NJ One Health Task Force."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1992 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24AssemblyApproved P.L.2021, c.117.
2021-06-21AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-0-1)
2021-06-21AssemblyReceived in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
2021-06-21SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2021-06-03Senate2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (38-0)
2021-04-19SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2021-03-01AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-0-0)
2021-03-01AssemblySubstituted for A1992 (1R)
2021-01-29AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2021-01-28SenatePassed by the Senate (32-0)
2020-09-14SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S4003 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1992 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Substituted by S347 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback