NJ S347 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1191
Note: Carry Foward to future A1889
Note: Carry Over of previous S3123
Note: Carry Foward to future A1889
Note: Carry Over of previous S3123
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns outreach and training for minorities and women in the construction industry.
Title
Concerns outreach and training for minorities and women in the construction industry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S347 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S347 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S3123 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - Substituted by A1855
A2408 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S347 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S3123 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - Substituted by A1855
A2408 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S347 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S0500/347_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S347 |