NJ S3456 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Substituted by A4897 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits 20 year ferry boat local public contracts; permits 50 year local public contracts for certain capital improvements and extends prevailing wage requirements to certain work performed under those contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits 20 year ferry boat local public contracts; permits 50 year local public contracts for certain capital improvements and extends prevailing wage requirements to certain work performed under those contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateSubstituted by A4897 (1R)
2019-03-04SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4897 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Approved P.L.2019, c.79.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback