NJ A4897 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Approved P.L.2019, c.79.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Permits 20 year ferry boat local public contracts; permits 50 year local public contracts for certain capital improvements and extends prevailing wage requirements to certain work performed under those contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits 20 year ferry boat local public contracts; permits 50 year local public contracts for certain capital improvements and extends prevailing wage requirements to certain work performed under those contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3456 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.79.
2019-03-14SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0)
2019-03-14SenateSubstituted for S3456 (1R)
2019-03-04SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-03-04SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
2019-02-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
2019-02-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-17AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3456 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Substituted by A4897 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback