NJ S3422 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-2-5)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires declaration of Code Blue alert when National Weather Service predicts temperatures of 32 degrees Fahrenheit or lower.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires declaration of Code Blue alert when National Weather Service predicts temperatures of 32 degrees Fahrenheit or lower.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A6056 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-2-5)
2020-01-13AssemblySubstituted for A6056
2019-12-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-12-12AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-06-20AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
2019-06-20SenatePassed by the Senate (34-2)
2019-06-06SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A6056 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3422 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback