NJ S3413 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved P.L.2019, c.72.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Makes certain changes to summary action foreclosure process under "Fair Foreclosure Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes certain changes to summary action foreclosure process under "Fair Foreclosure Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5005 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.72.
2019-03-25SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0)
2019-03-25SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-03-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (80-0-0)
2019-03-25AssemblySubstituted for A5005 (2R)
2019-03-25AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Armato)
2019-03-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-03-25SenatePassed by the Senate (36-0)
2019-02-21SenateSenate Amendment (28-0) (Singleton)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5005 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S3413 (3R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback