NJ S3332 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S914
Note: Carry Foward to future A2350
Note: Carry Foward to future A699
Note: Carry Over of previous A3335
Note: Carry Foward to future A2350
Note: Carry Foward to future A699
Note: Carry Over of previous A3335
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes program allowing certain applicants to perform community service in lieu of paying motor vehicle surcharges.
Title
Establishes program allowing certain applicants to perform community service in lieu of paying motor vehicle surcharges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-5) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3332 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3332 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3332 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A1988 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3335 (Carry Over) 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S1585 (1R)
S3332 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3332 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A1988 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3335 (Carry Over) 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S1585 (1R)