NJ S3305 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1118
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows tax credits for nonresidential and multifamily building improvement expenses to reduce spread of COVID-19.
Title
Allows tax credits for nonresidential and multifamily building improvement expenses to reduce spread of COVID-19.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Sen. James Holzapfel [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (32-0) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3305 (Carry Over) 2021-03-08 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A5389 (Same As) 2021-03-08 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A5389 (Same As) 2021-03-08 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee