NJ S3300 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1960
Note: Carry Over of previous A5499
Note: Carry Over of previous A5499
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A1727 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A1727 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Attorney General to perform outreach and provide services to victims of human trafficking under certain circumstances.
Title
Requires Attorney General to perform outreach and provide services to victims of human trafficking under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-14 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | Substituted by A1727 (1R) |
2023-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3300 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A1727 (1R)
A1727 (Same As) 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.297.
A5499 (Carry Over) 2021-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
A1727 (Same As) 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.297.
A5499 (Carry Over) 2021-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee