NJ S3287 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A5121
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A5121
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns provision of energy to certain manufacturing facilities by providing exemptions to certain energy related taxes.
Title
Concerns provision of energy to certain manufacturing facilities by providing exemptions to certain energy related taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] |
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Senate | Substituted by A5121 |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5121 (Same As) 2021-09-16 - Approved P.L.2021, c.213.